U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00181
  • Case Name: Teton v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 17, 2015: [Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order]
  • June 26, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 26, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2015: [Declaration]
May, 2015
  • May 28, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.