U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Hyatt v. Barlow-Hust
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 20, 2015: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • July 16, 2015: [Dismiss]
May, 2015
  • May 29, 2015: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.