U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Bennett v. HSBC Bank USA, NA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 31, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 28, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 21, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 14, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 03, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 09, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • July 09, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 08, 2015: [Joinder]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 02, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 02, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 23, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 17, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 17, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • June 01, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.