U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Teton v. Suarez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 17, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Declaration]
  • June 17, 2015: [Declaration]
  • June 03, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.