U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Rheinschild Family Trust v. Rankin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • March 22, 2016: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 07, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 07, 2016: [Protective Order]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Order]
  • December 14, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • December 07, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 04, 2015: [Stipulation]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • November 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 12, 2015: [Seal Document]
  • November 12, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 09, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 09, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 03, 2015: [Stipulation]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 26, 2015: [Stay]
  • October 22, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 22, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 22, 2015: [Affidavit in Support]
  • October 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 01, 2015: [Relief]
  • October 01, 2015: [Strike]
  • October 01, 2015: [Response to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 17, 2015: [Expedite]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order]
  • September 16, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 28, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 28, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • August 14, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 13, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 20, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • July 15, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 14, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 10, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 30, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • June 26, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 26, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • June 26, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • June 26, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 26, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 26, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order]
  • June 16, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • June 04, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.