U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. United States Forest Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 11, 2019: [Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 28, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • November 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 13, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • June 13, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • June 08, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 09, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [1-Exparte Document-to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • January 27, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 27, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 27, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 27, 2016: [Intervene]
  • January 11, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 21, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order]
  • October 19, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order]
  • August 31, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 31, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • August 31, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • August 21, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 20, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 20, 2015: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 20, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 11, 2015: [Consent Filed]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 04, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.