U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Wayne Enterprises, LLC et al v. McGhee et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Return Mail]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Default Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 15, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 13, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • July 12, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 29, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 29, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 11, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 10, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 10, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2015
  • August 03, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2015
  • June 05, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.