U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Joyner et al v. Christon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Letter]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 31, 2015: [Judgment]
June, 2015
  • June 08, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.