U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00003
  • Case Name: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Watts Water Quality and Conditioning Products
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 24, 2015: [Dismiss]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Order]
  • July 16, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 16, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 17, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 17, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2015: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.