U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:01-cv-00400
  • Case Name: Pratt v. Idaho, State of, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [USCA Order]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order]
  • January 05, 2016: [USCA Order]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 12, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
October, 2015
  • October 02, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • June 25, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2015: [Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.