U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00204
  • Case Name: Hulse v. Hastings Entertainment, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Status Report]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
  • June 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Compel]
  • June 01, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 27, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 13, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • June 15, 2015: [Order]
  • June 15, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 12, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.