U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Cascade Aircraft Management, LLC v. Weeks et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 24, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Status Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 21, 2015: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • October 21, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 05, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 02, 2015: [Third Party Complaint]
  • October 02, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 02, 2015: [Counterclaim]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 10, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 01, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 12, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.