U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Guzman Rivadeneira v. Department of Homeland Security et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Return Mail]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 28, 2015: [Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Order]
  • July 08, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 15, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.