U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Anderson et al v. Bank of America, National Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Vacate]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 16, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 12, 2016: [Response (generic)]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 19, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • February 18, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 09, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • February 09, 2016: [Letter]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 27, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 13, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • October 01, 2015: [Response (generic)]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • September 14, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2015: [Response to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 10, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • August 06, 2015: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • August 05, 2015: [Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 23, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 20, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 17, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 15, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 15, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 13, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 13, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 13, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • July 13, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order]
  • June 15, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 15, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • June 15, 2015: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.