U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Autiello v. Meridian Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Order]
  • November 02, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 30, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 22, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 04, 2015: [Consent Filed]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order]
  • August 27, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 30, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 27, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2015: [Summons Reissued]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • June 15, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.