U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00209
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bowmans, Inc. of Mountain Home
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Costs Taxed]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Bill of Costs]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • September 28, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 25, 2015: [Entry of Default]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • June 16, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.