U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Rock v. HT Recovery, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 05, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 02, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 02, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Order]
  • June 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Stay]
  • May 17, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 21, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 21, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • January 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 19, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • November 23, 2015: [Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 21, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 18, 2015: [Order]
  • September 15, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 28, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 21, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 20, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 16, 2015: [Summons Reissued]
  • July 09, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 09, 2015: [Errata]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 08, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 08, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 01, 2015: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Summons Reissued]
  • June 18, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.