U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00215
  • Case Name: Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Seattle, Inc. et al v. Jac
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 04, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 18, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 17, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 17, 2015: [Statement]
  • December 16, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 09, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 07, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.