U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project v. U.S. Forest Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • April 18, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Appeal Transcript Request]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Supplement]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Expedite]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 28, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Supplement]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Strike]
  • March 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 18, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Administrative Record]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 23, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • November 12, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 11, 2015: [Intervene]
  • November 11, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 11, 2015: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Response to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 27, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 14, 2015: [Errata]
  • August 13, 2015: [Errata]
  • August 13, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 12, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 12, 2015: [Intervene]
  • August 12, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 12, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 23, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 22, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 22, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.