U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00212
  • Case Name: Bonzelet v. Alcoa Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 24, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 04, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order]
  • July 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2015: [Stipulation]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Order]
  • June 24, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 23, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • June 22, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.