U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Bracero v. Idaho Housing and Finance Association
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 14, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 04, 2015: [Statement]
  • December 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Stipulation]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 13, 2015: [Statement]
  • October 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 02, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2015: [Declaration]
  • August 03, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Supplement]
  • July 29, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 29, 2015: [Declaration]
  • July 28, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 10, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • July 06, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order]
  • July 01, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.