U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00219
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project v. USDA APHIS Wildlife Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 05, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 05, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order]
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 19, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 13, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 04, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 04, 2015: [Consent Filed]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 30, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 29, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.