U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cv-00394
  • Case Name: Idaho Wool Growers Association et al v. Schafer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 27, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Order]
  • May 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2015: [Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 10, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 24, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.