U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Sapp v. Ada County Medical et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Reconsideration]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Supplement]
July, 2015
  • July 13, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 06, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 24, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 24, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.