U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00203
  • Case Name: Teton v. Fort Hall Police Department
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 08, 2015: [Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order]
  • August 05, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 31, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Declaration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.