U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Goldberg v. Northwest Trustee Services, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [USCA Order]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 19, 2015: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Order]
  • June 24, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 24, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.