U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00225
  • Case Name: Downing v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 16, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • September 21, 2015: [Administrative Record]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • July 08, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 06, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 25, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.