U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00226
  • Case Name: Macik v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Change Venue]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Reopen Case]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Compel]
  • July 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2016: [Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order]
  • April 29, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2016: [Letter]
  • April 11, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 07, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • March 15, 2016: [USCA Order]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 03, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [USCA Order]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [USCA Order]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 04, 2015: [Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Request]
  • July 08, 2015: [Supplement]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 25, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 25, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.