U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cv-00559
  • Case Name: Knight et al v. Correction Corporation of America Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 21, 2017: [Appeal Transcript]
  • November 21, 2017: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 15, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • November 15, 2017: [Appeal Transcript]
  • November 09, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Objection to Bill of Costs]
  • October 17, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • October 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 26, 2017: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 06, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 06, 2017: [Alter Judgment]
  • April 05, 2017: [Alter Judgment]
  • April 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 05, 2017: [New Trial]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Special Verdict Form]
  • March 01, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 01, 2017: [Jury Notes]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 27, 2017: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • February 27, 2017: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • February 21, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • February 20, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • February 10, 2017: [Objection]
  • February 07, 2017: [Strike]
  • February 06, 2017: [Objection]
  • February 06, 2017: [Errata]
  • February 06, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 30, 2017: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • January 30, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 30, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • January 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 26, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 26, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 23, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 23, 2017: [Witness List]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order to Transport]
  • January 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order]
  • December 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 23, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Quash]
  • November 21, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 18, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order]
  • November 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 11, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 11, 2016: [In Limine]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 10, 2016: [In Limine]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 26, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2016: [Bifurcate]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Reconsideration]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Response to Objection to R&R]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 21, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 03, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 24, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2015: [Sanctions]
  • September 03, 2015: [Sealed Document]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 27, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 26, 2015: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.