U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Zazzali v. Barton
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • January 19, 2017: [Status Report]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 03, 2015: [Stipulation]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2015: [Set Aside Default]
  • October 08, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Compel]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 28, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 24, 2015: [Entry of Default]
  • September 01, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 11, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Order]
  • June 25, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.