U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Crop Production Services, Inc. v. Super Kat Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 23, 2017: [Judgment - Consent]
  • March 22, 2017: [Errata]
  • March 22, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 21, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 21, 2016: [Stay]
  • January 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 19, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sanctions]
  • January 11, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 21, 2015: [ADR Plan]
  • December 18, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 05, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 28, 2015: [Seal Document]
  • July 28, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • July 02, 2015: [Redacted Document]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Seal Document]
  • June 26, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 26, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • June 25, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.