U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00231
  • Case Name: South v. Walter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Summons Issued]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 26, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 26, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.