U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Sparks v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Response to Habeas Petition]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 09, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order]
  • June 26, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 26, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.