U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Lancaster et al v. Kordsiemon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 15, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 11, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • November 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order]
  • September 29, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 29, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 16, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 07, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • June 06, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 05, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Exclude]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Order]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 11, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2015: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 30, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 30, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 27, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 16, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 15, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 14, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 09, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 09, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 01, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • July 01, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 01, 2015: [Supplement]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.