U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Joe Hand Productions, Inc. v. Blue Hashi, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 03, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 09, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 06, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 18, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 05, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order]
  • July 01, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.