U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00242
  • Case Name: Crispin v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 27, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • September 28, 2015: [Administrative Record]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 16, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 01, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • July 01, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • July 01, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 01, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.