U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:94-cv-00142
  • Case Name: Dunlap v. Arave
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Status Report]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Status Report]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Status Report]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Status Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Status Report]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Status Report]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Status Report]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Status Report]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Status Report]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Status Report]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Status Report]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Status Report]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Status Report]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Status Report]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Status Report]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Letter]
  • October 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2015: [Status Report]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.