U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00240
  • Case Name: Franz v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 17, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 15, 2015: [Remand]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 08, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 27, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • September 28, 2015: [Administrative Record]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 17, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • July 01, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 01, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 01, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.