U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00243
  • Case Name: Diversified Metal Products, Inc. v. TRC Fabrication, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 11, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2015: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • October 12, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Crossclaim]
  • September 21, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 21, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 17, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 17, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 14, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.