U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Johnson v. O'Brien
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 28, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [ADR Plan]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 18, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 01, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2015: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.