U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00236
  • Case Name: L'Abbe' v. Wiedemann et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 02, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 18, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2015: [Response to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 11, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 07, 2015: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 04, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 04, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 22, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 01, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 01, 2015: [Receipt]
  • July 01, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.