U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Beehive Federal Credit Union et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 04, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 10, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 06, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 05, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 23, 2015: [Stipulation]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 01, 2015: [Receipt]
  • July 01, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.