U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Bingham et al v. Jefferson County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 24, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 25, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Strike]
  • June 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 28, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 27, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 07, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 06, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.