U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00246
  • Case Name: Idaho Conservation League et al v. Lannom et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 04, 2017: [Receipt]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Stay]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2016: [Declaration]
  • August 11, 2016: [Expedite]
  • August 11, 2016: [Alter Judgment]
  • August 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [File Amicus Brief]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 11, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 16, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 07, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.