U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00247
  • Case Name: Dowdy et al v. VA Department of Veterans Affairs Regional Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 04, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 10, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 14, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 14, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 09, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 08, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 07, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.