U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Harmon v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 03, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 12, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • September 09, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [ADR Plan]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.