U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00252
  • Case Name: Graham v. Lakes Highway District, Kootenai County, Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 10, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • April 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 21, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Stipulation]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2015: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • August 04, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Strike]
  • July 31, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • July 31, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 31, 2015: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • July 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 14, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 13, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 13, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • July 08, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 08, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 08, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.