U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00255
  • Case Name: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company v. Campbell's Siding & Windows et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 04, 2016: [~Util - Case Stayed]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 13, 2016: [Statement]
  • January 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 13, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 05, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Order]
  • October 21, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 15, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 14, 2015: [Consent Filed]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 21, 2015: [Order]
  • August 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 14, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 13, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 10, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 09, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 09, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 09, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.