U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00251
  • Case Name: Burdge v. College of Western Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 21, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 04, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • October 13, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2015: [Response to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • September 04, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 10, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2015: [Default Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 15, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 09, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 09, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 09, 2015: [Receipt]
  • July 09, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.