U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00253
  • Case Name: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. Sheppard et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 04, 2015: [Letter]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order]
  • July 14, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 10, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.